KIDS FOR KIDS

Charity number: 1100045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity seeks the relief of children in Darfur, Sudan, who are in need, hardship or distress, working with local partners to provide integrated grassroots projects identified and run by the communities - water, goat and donkey loans, mosquito nets, blankets, healthcare for mothers and babies, veterinary care, education, livelihood techniques, agricultural and environmental projects.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey
  • Sudan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 October 2003: Standard registration
  • 30 July 2024: Funds received from 516725 ROTARY CLUB OF SOUTH HOLLAND TRUST FUND
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PATRICIA MARIAN PARKER MBE Chair 03 December 2002
None on record
KAREN JANKEL Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
Lee Traxon Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Khalid Mekki Osman Abulrahman Trustee 11 November 2021
None on record
Elizabeth Anne Sutton Trustee 11 December 2020
DELAMERE DAIRY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ALASTAIR KING-SMITH Trustee 06 October 2003
THE NEXT CENTURY FOUNDATION
Received: 236 days late
MR DANTE CAMPAILLA Trustee 03 December 2002
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £461.99k £509.28k £458.09k £527.84k £578.26k
Total expenditure £633.96k £508.55k £272.99k £199.98k £262.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £477.60k N/A £443.00k £511.43k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £24.46k N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A £67.03k £36.04k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £7.22k N/A £17.81k £30.79k
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £466.05k N/A £143.28k £174.76k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £42.49k N/A £0 £88.17k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A £3.20k £4.14k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £56.71k £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets N/A £0 N/A £418 £111
Long-term investments N/A £0 N/A £487.10k £508.69k
Other assets N/A £1.27m N/A £1.08m £1.39m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A £214.20k N/A £8.84k £10.35k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Richard Place Dobson
1-7 Station road
Crawley
West Sussex
RH10 1HT
Phone:
07957206440