NORTHUMBRIA ADVANCED MOTORCYCLISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Northumbria Advanced Motorcyclists (NAM) is a affiliated to The Institute of Advanced Motorists (IAM). Our main aim is to promote safe riding. Our volunteers train riders in the Northumbria area to reach an advanced standard which is recognised by the IAM. NAM also promotes social activities and charity fundraising for local charities.NAM works closely with the Police and Fire and Rescue Services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 02 September 2003: Standard registration
- NAM (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Colin Irvine | Chair | 29 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Baston | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rick Henderson | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Russell | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.42k | £5.10k | £4.88k | £6.20k | £5.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.53k | £3.33k | £3.14k | £7.18k | £5.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 APRIL 2003.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE STANDARD OF DRIVING AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF ROAD SAFETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 Newburgh Avenue
Seaton Delaval
WHITLEY BAY
Tyne And Wear
NE25 0JP
- Phone:
- 07921069496
- Email:
- treasurer@namrider.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window