Financial history PILL COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1099933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.67k £20.55k £11.98k £18.90k £73.85k
Total expenditure £13.79k £14.87k £13.37k £20.24k £50.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A