PILL COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information, Advice & Guidance Centre; Training - Basic & Intermediate IT, First Aid, Paediatric First Aid, Food Hygiene; access to Solicitor, Citizens Advice Bureau, Housing & Council Tax Benefit surgery, housing surgery. Use of computers, printers, photocopier, fax, laminating, telephone.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Somerset
Governance
- 09 October 2003: Standard registration
- PILL AND DISTRICT RESOURCE CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham George Hopkins | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Aileen Edwards | Trustee | 30 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Jean Burt | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Jane Osborne | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Blaney | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jade Ang | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Jill Coleman | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN TAYLOR | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR MIKE BURNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN ANTHONY THATCHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.67k | £20.55k | £11.98k | £18.90k | £73.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.79k | £14.87k | £13.37k | £20.24k | £50.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 2ND APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PILL, EASTON-IN-GORDANO AND HAM GREEN (AS DELINEATED IN THE MAP ATTACHED AND HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION AND FOR IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
NORTH SOMERSET, EASTON-IN-GORDANO
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE RESOURCE CENTRE
4 BALTIC PLACE
PILL
NORTH SOMERSET
BS20 0EJ
- Phone:
- 01275375670
- Email:
- pillresource@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window