THE JOHN R. MURRAY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees shall pay or apply the income of the trust fund and pay or apply the whole or any part of the capital of the trust fund to such charities or for such charitable purposes as the trustees shall from time to time in their absolute uncontrolled discretion think fit. In the medium term the trustees' principal aim will be the continued support of the National Library of Scotland.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Murray | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIRGINIA GWENDOLINE MURRAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HALLAM JOHN ROBIN GREY MURRAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN OCTAVIUS GREY MURRAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES JOHN GREY MURRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £566.74k | £340.62k | £295.21k | £227.18k | £240.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.51m | £1.30m | £2.92m | £5.57m | £1.90m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £566.74k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.32m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £190.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.41k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.27m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £190.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST 16 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND AND MAY ALSO TRANSFER PAY OR APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE AND UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 ALBEMARLE STREET
LONDON
W1S 4BD
- Phone:
- 02074934361
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window