Accounts and annual returns RICHMOND USERS INDEPENDENT LIVING SCHEME RUILS

Charity number: 1099930
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 23 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 02 December 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 08 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 17 March 2008 46 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 14 February 2007 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 14 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 29 March 2006 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time