STROKE SUPPORT WEST MIDLANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offer help and support to stroke survivors, their carers and family. Activities include weekly exercise session and mutual support. Aim to enable survivors to lead as normal life as possible by organising regular outings. Meals, gliding, sports day are a few of the activities we offer. We also provide information to improve the treatment of strokes and the subsequent rehabilitation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 13 November 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Metcalfe Stevens | Trustee | 05 December 2015 |
|
|||||
DAWN VALERIE EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.04k | £1.07k | £924 | £4.07k | £6.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.75k | £0 | £0 | £5.28k | £5.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 February 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 FEBRUARY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 11 OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECT OF STROKES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ILLNESS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 School Road
Clun
CRAVEN ARMS
Shropshire
SY7 8JQ
- Phone:
- 07455 051258
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window