HELPING HANDS FOR UNDER PRIVILEGED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE HELP TO ELIMINATE CHILD LABOUR AND EDUCATE THE UNDERPRIVILEGED. WE SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGE THE CHILDREN, WHO WERE FORMALLY ENGAGED IN CHILD LABOUR TO ATTEND SCHOOL. WE ALSO FEED AND CLOTHE THEM. WE SUPPORT VULNERABLE,ELDERLY AND SICK PEOPLE.IN ADDITION WE HAVE A WATER PROJECT FOR TWO VILLAGES TO PROVIDE CLEAN DRINKING WATER FOR THE PEOPLE. VOLUNTARY REIKI HEALING TO THE CHILDREN IN UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Harrow
- India
Governance
- 28 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAVITRI SRIHARAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Ananth Kumar Babu Nalabanda | Trustee | 21 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Balameera Ravindrarajah | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vinitha Indrani De Alwis | Trustee | 19 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MEERA GARRATT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR AID GARRATT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.92k | £15.84k | £11.13k | £17.05k | £18.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.16k | £11.86k | £14.36k | £13.24k | £14.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 AUGUST 2003 AS AMENDED 14 OCTOBER 2003, AS AMENDED 14TH MARCH 2004.
Charitable objects
2.1 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN RAMAAMUDRAM, ANDHRA PRADESH, INDIA 2.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING PRIMARILY AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A SCHOOL AND THE PROVISION OF SKILLS BASED TRAINING FOR ADULTS. 2.3 THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A CENTRE FOR THE TRAINING AND PRACTICE OF REIKI AND IMPROVING KNOWLEDGE IN RELATION TO PUBLIC HEALTH MATTERS. 2.4 TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR ALL HEALTH PROBLEMS OF INDIVIDUALS, IN PARTICULAR THE DISABLED AND THE ELDERLY, THROUGH REIKI HEALING TREATMENT, BOTH IN THE UK AND ABROAD.
Area of benefit
RAMAAMUDRAM, ANDHRA PRADESH, INDIA AND UK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Paddocks Close
Harrow
HA2 8NP
- Phone:
- 07515120326
- Email:
- savitrihh4u@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window