Accounts and annual returns FOUNTAIN HOUSE CHAPEL INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1099594
Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Annual return 01 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
Annual return 01 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days
Annual return 01 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days
Annual return 01 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days