GATEWAY FREEDOM CHURCH, HARLOW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gateway Freedom Church, Harlow is a member of the "Partners in Harvest" network of churches. Its vision is to "follow Jesus" - to become more and more like Jesus and to show God's love and character to a needy world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 03 October 2003: Standard registration
- 12 September 2024: Funds received from 1043787 FRESHWATERS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
- GATEWAY CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP HARLOW (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMY JADE George | Trustee | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bridgette Dorinda Fraser | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Leslie Raymond East | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Bryan Stanesby | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £214.48k | £447.93k | £59.99k | £102.53k | £92.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £223.47k | £322.50k | £126.56k | £78.52k | £68.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.40k | £350 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 July 2024 | 162 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 July 2024 | 162 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 AUGUST 2003 AS AMENDED 23 NOVEMBER 2004 AND BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 6 MAY 2010 as amended on 26 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN HARLOW AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY; (B) TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN FACILITIES (WHETHER IN A PURPOSE-BUILT COMMUNITY CENTRE OR OTHERWISE) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF HARLOW AND SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD WHICH FACILITIES MAY WITHOUT LIMITATION INCLUDE THE PROVISION OF CHILD CARE SERVICES AND MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF EDUCATION, RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, SEX POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SAID INHABITANTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
HARLOW AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gateway Hub
Maddox Road
HARLOW
Essex
CM20 3RW
- Phone:
- 07783 308573
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window