THE RUGBY PORTOBELLO TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Rugby Portobello Trust provides supported housing for vulnerable young people, runs a small school for students aged fourteen to sixteen who are excluded or self excluding from mainstream education and also provides youth work programmes including those based around sports and arts activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 17 October 2003: Standard registration
- 14 July 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 14 July 2020: Funds transferred to 703163 PEOPLE POTENTIAL POSSIBILITIES
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 17 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 11 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 25 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 22 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
1 - TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE PRIMARILY IN NORTH KENSINGTON AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA WITH A PREFERENCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF INSTRUCTION AND TRAINING IN PROFESSIONS, VOCATIONS, INDUSTRIES, CRAFTS AND TRADES AND BY THE PROMOTION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY; 2- TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY AND DISTRESS OF PEOPLE PRIMARILY RESIDENT IN NORTH KENSINGTON AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA WITH A PREFERENCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, COUNSELLING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT AND FINANCIAL AND OTHER ASSISTANCE
Area of benefit
NORTH KENSINGTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window