FUND THEIR FUTURE

Charity number: 1100200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

relief of poverty world wide

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £88,992
Total expenditure: £140,715

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 October 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • FUND THE FUTURE (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JULIE HELLENS Trustee 18 December 2016
None on record
Andrew Robb Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £103.77k £27.79k £27.79k £822 £88.99k
Total expenditure £134.20k £87.05k £87.05k £67.11k £140.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 09 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 09 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 15 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 15 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 16 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 18 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE COACH HOUSE
38 COTHAM HILL
BRISTOL
BS6 6LA
Phone:
01179743656
Website:

No information available