Financial history KENTON LODGE APPEAL

Charity number: 1100061
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2005 31/08/2006 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009
Total gross income £5.55k £2.49k £683 £221 £0
Total expenditure £4.64k £3.11k £835 £161 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A