THE EMMA MALTBY MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Fund's main activity is to fund Learning Mentors in the Teenage Cancer Trust Unit at St James's Hospital in Leeds. The role of the Learning Mentor is to assist patients to ensure that they can continue with their education whilst they are undergoing their treatment for cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 10 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLOTTE JANE STEVENS | Chair |
|
||||
PAUL STEVENS | Trustee |
|
||||
WENDY MORRELL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.23k | £6.20k | £1.06k | £960 | £960 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.24k | £0 | £1.06k | £960 | £960 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF PERSONS FROM WEST YORKSHIRE WHO ARE RECOVERING OR HAVE RECOVERED FROM CANCER AND OTHER LIFE-THREATENING DISEASES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY; A) PROVIDING BURSARIES TO ASSIST YOUNG PEOPLE TO CONTINUE THEIR EDUCATION FOLLOWING RECOVERY, B) SUPPORTING THE WORK OF ST MARTINS HOSPICE, WETHERBY, WEST YORKSHIRE, C) SUPPORTING LOCAL CANCER CHARITIES
Area of benefit
WEST YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Greenthwaite
Main Street
Upper Poppleton
York
YO26 6DL
- Phone:
- 01904270785
- Email:
- greenthwaite@icloud.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window