THE INTERNATIONAL AYURVEDA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of IAF is to promote Traditional Systems of Medicines, in particular age old Ayurveda System of medicines for the benefit of human health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Germany
- India
- Switzerland
Governance
- 27 July 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIVYANGKUMAR ACHARYA | Chair | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Poojan Acharya | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chiragben Acharya | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.50k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.72k | £7.70k | £8.22k | £7.99k | £7.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2024 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 February 2021 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 28 OCTOBER 2004.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE KNOWLEDGE OF, RESEARCH IN ALTERNATIVE FORMS OF MEDICINE AND SCHOOLS AND TRADITIONS OF MEDICINES AND CULTURES, SUCH AS AYURVEDA AND TO PROMOTE AN UNDERSTANDING OF THE SPIRITUAL AND SCIENTIFIC BASIS OF THE VALUES PROPOUNDED BY SUCH SCHOOLS AND TRADITIONS, BUT NOT LIMITED TO INCLUDING AYURVEDA; (B) TO EDUCATE THE GENERAL PUBLIC, MEDICAL DOCTORS AND COMPLEMENTARY PRACTITIONERS IN ALL AREAS OF HOLISTIC HEALTH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO AYURVEDA; (C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS WORLDWIDE AND PROVIDE TREATMENT, CARE AND ASSISTANCE TO ALL THOSE WHO REQUIRE MEDICAL TREATMENT, THROUGH USE OF ALTERNATIVE TREATMENTS, INCLUDING USE OF BUT NOT LIMITED TO AYURVEDA; (D) TO CARRY OUT RESEARCH INTO ALL AREAS OF HOLISTIC HEALTH CARE INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO AYURVEDA AND TRADITIONAL MEDICAL SYSTEMS AND REMEDIES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND MATTERS DIRECTLY OF INDIRECTLY RELATED THERETO AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Kenmore Avenue
HARROW
Middlesex
HA3 8PG
- Phone:
- 02075800897
- Email:
- divyangacharya@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window