WESTMINSTER BANGLADESHI ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote any charitable purpose for the benefit of the inhabitants of Westminster, particularly Bangladeshi persons from the Asian community, by associating together the inhabitants and the local authorities, voluntary and other organisations to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation, WBA services is open to all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 24 September 2003: Standard registration
- WBA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Monjur Morshed | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kamru Miah | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shaik Jewel Ahmed | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shorif Uddin | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED JANAL | Trustee | 05 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Foysal Shah Muhammed | Trustee | 16 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Md Moboshir Ali | Trustee | 16 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Noshad Miah | Trustee | 12 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHAFIQUR RAHMAN | Trustee | 30 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
MUKITH ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MD SHAHID MIAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HASNAT SABREE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOYNA MIAH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.09k | £30.88k | £5.21k | £22.22k | £29.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.33k | £9.12k | £18.92k | £23.80k | £27.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £2.70k | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 March 2023 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JUNE 2003, AS AMENDED ON THE 13TH NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WESTMINSTER, PARTICULARLY BANGLADESHI PERSONS FROM THE ASIAN COMMUNITY BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
CITY OF WESTMINSTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Westminster Bangladeshi Association
Pimlico Resource Centre
Walston House
Aylesford street
London
SW1V 3RL
- Phone:
- 02073286500
- Email:
- wbasw1@aol.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window