Governing document GREAT GLEN U3A INTERESTS GROUP

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/04/2002 AS AMENDED ON 14/05/2013 AS AMENDED ON 12/05/2015 as amended on 08 May 2018 as amended on 14 May 2019 as amended on 01 Dec 2020 as amended on 29 Jan 2025 as amended on 29 Jan 2025 as amended on 29 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
The charity’s objects (“objects”) are the advancement of education, and in particular the education of older people and those retired from full time work, by all means including associated activities conducive to learning and personal development in Great Glen, Oadby, Wigston and surrounding areas.
Area of benefit
GREAT GLEN AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.