Clube Nova Vida Angola

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holdhands organises sports activities for young people and children aged 8 to 16. Offers activities, including entertainment for senior people of our community to overcome isolation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 September 2003: Standard registration
- HOLDHANDS - ANGOLAN CHARITY ORGANISATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louis Sequeira | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tatiana Jose | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £100 | £1.71k | £2.74k | £534 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £100 | £400 | £1.14k | £939 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 April 2024 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 February 2022 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 March 2021 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 14TH SEPTEMBER 2001 as amended on 01 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
1 TO RELIEVE POVERTY OF ANGOLAN PEOPLE IN THE UK AND GLOBAL 2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION 3 PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, INCLUDING RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ANGOLAN COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
UK AND GLOBAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Homefield Road
EDGWARE
Middlesex
HA8 0PT
- Phone:
- 07956440494
- Email:
- novavidaangola@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window