THE NOTTINGHAM OASIS BREAST CANCER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Nottingham Oasis Breast Cancer Trust is an expense free charity helping ladies who have had breast cancer. Our aim is to help with the financial difficulties individuals face and their families after or before facing hospital treatment. We help people with bespoke clothing to help with aftercare treatment also.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 September 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joseph Paul Brien | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Penny Marie Mascari | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Stuart Lawrence Pearson | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUE MCKENZIE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.88k | £160 | £200 | £70 | £3.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.59k | £2.53k | £2.40k | £61 | £902 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 27 May 2024 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 May 2023 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 April 2022 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 06 March 2021 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
(I) FOR OR TOWARDS THE BENEFIT OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT. (II) WITHOUT DETRACTING FROM THE GENERAL NATURE OF THE CHARITABLE TRUST IN (I) ABOVE, THE TRUSTEES MAY AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THEY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT APPLY THE INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND AND ALL SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL TOWARDS THE PROVISION OF OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES FOR THE TREATMENT AND RELIEF OF OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM BREAST CANCER AND ANY OTHER CANCERS AND THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES IF AND A CURE FOR BREAST CANCER AND ANY OTHER CANCERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 FIENNES CRESCENT
NOTTINGHAM
NG7 1ER
- Phone:
- 07787912712
- Email:
- JANEMASCARI@LIVE.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window