Accounts and annual returns HOLY TRINITY SCHOOL PTA (MARLOW)

Charity number: 1099466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 20 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 20 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 October 2024 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 20 October 2024 112 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 December 2023 181 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 28 December 2023 181 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 October 2022 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 March 2022 249 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 06 March 2022 249 days late Download Open in new window