Accounts and annual returns FAMILY MATTERS (BOURNEMOTH, DORSET AND POOLE) LIMITED

Charity number: 1099495
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 04 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 04 December 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 11 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 24 October 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 02 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 02 November 2010 On Time