HOUSEGUESTS UNLIMITED TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Trust is to enable child carers to have a holiday with their family. The Trust raises funds to enable families to stay at a specially adapted villa in Florida, close to all the main attractions. The Trust covers the costs for the holiday including flights, admission tickets and any special equipment which may be needed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 October 2003: Standard registration
- 05 July 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2006 | 30/06/2007 | 30/06/2008 | 30/06/2009 | 30/06/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.82k | £14.54k | £9.60k | £9.70k | £6.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.58k | £11.68k | £10.77k | £9.15k | £6.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2010 | 28 April 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | 06 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | 04 April 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 SEPTEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AND IMPROVE THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF DISABLED PARENTS, AND THEIR CHILDREN AND CARERS, BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS WHO WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE ABLE TO DO SO, TO ENJOY A HOLIDAY TOGETHER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window