Financial history CHAPLAINCY PLUS

Charity number: 1100383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £72.96k £82.71k £93.86k £63.98k £46.92k
Total expenditure £70.43k £78.05k £104.95k £63.02k £44.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A