Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF MALI - UK

Charity number: 1105719
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 07 November 2008 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 16 November 2007 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 08 November 2006 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 07 March 2006 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required