LIGHT AND LIFE MINISTRIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raised funds that were sent to missions work in Mozambique, Ethiopia, Kenya and America. The funds were used for education and training in Christian life principles as well as leadership development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ethiopia
- India
- Ireland
- Kenya
- Lebanon
- Mozambique
- Philippines
- United States
Governance
- 03 November 2003: Standard registration
- 24 September 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LIGHT AND LIFE MINISTRIES POYNTON (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.49k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.39k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 19 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 16 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 01 December 2014 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 MAY 2003, AS AMENDED 20 OCTOBER 2003 AND 6 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST THE LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE WORD OF GOD BY THE MINISTRY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FUNDAMENTAL TRUTHS OF ASSEMBLIES OD GOD IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND AS APPROVED BY THE GENERAL COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME (THE STATEMENT) (2) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL FURTHER THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS OF THE MINISTRY OR ANY OF THEM (3 ) THE FURTHERANCE OF THE OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE MINISTRY CONSISTENTLY WITH THE STATEMENT (4) THE FURTHERANCE OF THE WORK OF ASSEMBLIES OF GOD IN GREAT BRITAIN, IRELAND AND OVERSEAS AND THE PROMOTION OF THE SPIRITUAL TEACHING AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE STATEMENT AND THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS OBSERVANCES THAT MANIFEST THE STATEMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window