MUCH WENLOCK FESTIVAL SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arts/culture Festival bi annually
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Shropshire
Governance
- 26 April 2004: Standard registration
- 27 July 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £477 | £30.28k | £1.57k | £39.58k | £653 | |
|
Total expenditure | £297 | £28.41k | £367 | £36.06k | £398 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 30 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 11 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 15 January 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 07 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 30 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | 30 April 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 11 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC OF MUCH WENLOCK, SHROPSHIRE IN THE ARTS (IN ALL THEIR FORMS) IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE ORGANISATION OF: A BIENNIAL ARTS FESTIVAL, ARTS EVENTS AND CREATIVE ARTS ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
MUCH WENLOCK, SHROPSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window