HIVES SAVE LIVES - AFRICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We combat poverty by supporting income generation through beekeeping. We provide hives, training and equipment, manufactured locally, to give communities the ability to create businesses around the sale of honey and other hive products, and to integrate beekeeping into current agricultural practices to maximise crop pollination and increase yields.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Uganda
Governance
- 09 October 2003: Standard registration
- HSLA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Mitchell | Trustee | 02 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER CHARLES VENTON | Trustee | 05 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £816 | £1.75k | £663 | £652 | £659 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.58k | £854 | £849 | £937 | £3.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 09 September 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3RD SEPTEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO ALLEVIATE POVERTY; AND TO PROVIDE EDUCATION, AND TRAINING THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, PARTICULARLY BY THE MANUFACTURE, PROVISION AND DISTRIBUTION OF BEE-KEEPING EQUIPMENT, THE DISSEMINATION OF BEE-KEEPING TECHNIQUES, AND THE PROVISION OF GUIDANCE TO SUCH PERSONS AS ARE IN NEED TO ENABLE THEM TO EARN THEIR OWN LIVING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
High Trees
Burts Lane
Mannington
Wimborne
BH21 7JT
- Phone:
- 07747788488
- Email:
- info@hivessavelives.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window