Accounts and annual returns THE LIBRA INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION (UK)
Charity number: 1106610
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 23 November 2008 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | 21 April 2008 | 266 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | 08 February 2008 | 193 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 29 November 2006 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window