CALVARY CHAPEL MANSFIELD LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 10 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cristobel Rodriguez | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
BRYCE MATTHEW HEARD | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|||||
MR JOHN BROOKS | Trustee | 31 July 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.05k | £86.58k | £80.09k | £104.95k | £129.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.01k | £77.94k | £85.33k | £103.12k | £121.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 June 2024 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 2ND SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
A. THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY; B. TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, BUT IN PRACTICE MANSFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bible Pattern Church
Eakring Road
MANSFIELD
NG18 3FS
- Phone:
- 07944521063
- Website:
-
calvarymansfield.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window