Financial history STEVENTON SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1099636
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.60k £13.77k £9.05k £8.31k £3.74k
Total expenditure £15.66k £7.39k £9.57k £9.34k £4.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A