BRITISH SJOGRENS SYNDROME ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The British Sjogren's Syndrome Association supports patients and carers, educates the public and professionals and raises funds for research into this disabling condition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
29 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 January 2004: Standard registration
- 31 March 2015: Funds received from 1043493 JAQUINE LACHMAN ARNOLD CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
- Sjögren's UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dorothy Louise Walker-Mountford | Chair | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Rimmington | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Porter | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Mary Wolstenholme | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
LINDA JANE STONE OBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.41k | £148.10k | £164.56k | £343.27k | £132.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160.16k | £102.26k | £106.08k | £168.03k | £197.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 MAY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 1.1 THE RELIEF OF PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM SJÖGREN’S SYNDROME OR OTHER DRY EYE AND/OR DRY MOUTH DISORDERS; 1.2 THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION FOR PATIENTS, CARERS, HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONALS AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY IN RESPECT OF SJÖGREN'S SYNDROME OR OTHER DRY EYE AND/OR DRY MOUTH DISORDERS TO INCLUDE BUT NOT LIMITED TO:- 1.2.1 THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF SJÖGREN'S SYNDROME OR OTHER DRY EYE AND/OR DRY MOUTH DISORDERS ON TERMS THAT THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH ARE PUBLISHED; AND 1.2.2 RAISING AWARENESS OF ALL ASPECTS OF SJÖGREN'S SYNDROME OR OTHER DRY EYE AND/OR DRY MOUTH DISORDERS AND THE WORK OF THE CHARITY. 1.3 THE PROVISION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR SUCH PATIENTS.?
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRITISH SJOGRENS SYNDROME ASS'N
PO BOX 15040
BIRMINGHAM
B31 9DP
- Phone:
- 01214780222
- Email:
- admin@sjogrensuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window