CWRT RAWLIN PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our PTA is a collaboration between the pupils, parents and teachers of Cwrt Rawlin Primary school. We organise events in conjunction with the school children and local community to have fun, socialise and improve engagement. We fundraise so the school can purchase resources and experiences for the pupils which they might not normally been able to do, due to budget restrictions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Caerphilly
Governance
- 10 October 2003: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF CWRT RAWLIN PRIMARY SCHOOL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Wright | Chair | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rasa Reardon | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Elvin | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Reardon | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Reed | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hanna Safadi | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Vallender | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Nicholls | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keely Jones | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Mitchell | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.26k | £8.37k | £1.45k | £2.64k | £6.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.84k | £8.86k | £5.07k | £3.36k | £1.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 11 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 22 January 2023 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | 26 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26TH FEBRUARY 2002 as amended on 29 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL OR TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, BUT IN PRACTICE CAERPHILLY, MID GLAMORGAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cwrt Rawlin PTA
c/o Cwrt Rawlin Primary School
Cae Meillion
CAERPHILLY
Mid Glamorgan
CF83 1SN
- Phone:
- 02920 807070
- Email:
- Info@cwrtrawlinpta.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window