Accounts and annual returns THE EDUCROSS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1099957
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 05 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 31 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 04 April 2019 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required