BRITISH NEUROSCIENCE ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The British Neuroscience Association (BNA) is the largest UK organisation representing neuroscientists and neuroscience, from ion channels to human behaviour to applications in the clinic and beyond. We welcome everyone interested in neuroscience to join us, and help support research into the nervous system in both health and disease.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 May 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Richard Nevill Astley Henson | Chair | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
NARENDER RAMNANI | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Sarah Louise King PhD | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Charles Ashby | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Edwin Walton | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Trevor John Bushell | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Catherine Mary Bird | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Tara Leigh Spires-Jones | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Volko Straub | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Alan Michael Palmer | Trustee | 17 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kevin Paul Cox | Trustee | 17 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Manfred Berners | Trustee | 17 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £274.98k | £223.98k | £163.50k | £404.42k | £322.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £223.16k | £233.41k | £250.75k | £319.24k | £364.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 25 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 25 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 OCT 2001 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 DEC 2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 MAR 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 APR 2017
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN NEUROSCIENCES RELATED TO HEALTH AND DISEASE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY: (A) PROMOTING ON A MULTIDISCIPLINARY BASIS THE STUDY OF THE DEVELOPMENT STRUCTURE AND FUNCTION OF THE NERVOUS SYSTEM IN HEALTH AND DISEASE. (B) PROMOTING THE DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION TO ALL THOSE INTERESTED IN THE NEUROSCIENCES AND RELATED DISCIPLINES BY MEANS OF LECTURES, DISCUSSIONS, MEETINGS AND REPORTS FROM TIME TO TIME OBTAINED FROM SUCH RESEARCHERS. (C) ADVISING AS FAR AS POSSIBLE ON ISSUES IN NEUROSCIENCES RELATED TO HEALTH AND DISEASE. (D) ENDEAVOURING TO INCREASE PUBLIC AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCH IN HEALTH AND DISEASE. (E) ASSISTING IN THE TRAINING OF NEUROSCIENTISTS AND OTHER PROFESSIONALS ENGAGED IN NEUROSCIENCE TEACHING AND RESEARCH. (F) REPRESENTING THE INTERESTS OF NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCHERS AND PROMOTING THE CASE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM TO GOVERNMENT, TO AGENCIES PROVIDING RESEARCH FUNDING AND TO BODIES ENGAGED IN SCIENCE ADMINISTRATION, REGULATION AND STANDARDS
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIVERSITY OF BRISTOL
THE DOROTHY HODGKIN BUILDING
WHITSON STREET
BRISTOL
BS1 3NY
- Phone:
- 07584016279
- Email:
- office@bna.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window