ESKDALE MILL HERITAGE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust has purchased Eskdale Mill on 30 November 2006 and vested the title in the company limited by guarantee of the same name, registered charity No 1113837. The Trust has been awarded an Awards for All grant which was in progress at 31 March 2007 and to be completed by 31 July 2007. At this point the trust is projected to be dissolved, and all activities to be conducted by the incorporated c
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 29 September 2003: Standard registration
- 02 October 2007: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 02 October 2007: Funds transferred to 1113837 ESKDALE MILL & HERITAGE TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.11k | £109.36k | £9.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.00k | £6.76k | £109.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 08 August 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 03 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 03 August 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 12 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 23 June 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24 JULY 2003.
Charitable objects
1) THE PRESERVATION AND DEVELOPMENT, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, OF THE 16TH CENTURY ESKDALE WATER CORN MILL AT BOOT BEING OF PARTICULAR HISTORICAL AND ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, HERITAGE, GEOGRAPHY AND GEOLOGY OF ESKDALE SO AS TO INCREASE THEIR UNDERSTANDING OF THE BUILT AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window