COMMUNITY SAFETY OFFICE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Camden
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 15 December 2003: Standard registration
- 14 October 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- COMMUNITY SAFETY OFFICE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 07 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 13 December 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 25TH NOVEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE POLICE WITHIN CAMDEN AND WESTMINSTER AND THE SOHO, BLOOMSBURY, COVENT GARDEN AND CHARING CROSS AREAS IN PARTICULAR AND TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND GREATER PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE SOLUTION AND PREVENTION OF CRIME WITHIN AND BETWEEN THOSE AREAS
Area of benefit
CAMDEN AND WESTMINSTER AND THE SOHO, BLOOMSBURY, COVENT GARDEN AND CHARING CROSS AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window