Accounts and annual returns RYKNELD C. P. SCHOOL P.T.F.A.

Charity number: 1099772
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 2 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 23 June 2024 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 18 May 2023 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 06 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 04 July 2021 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required