Financial history RYKNELD C. P. SCHOOL P.T.F.A.

Charity number: 1099772
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £12.53k £13.41k £3.02k £7.76k £17.07k
Total expenditure £13.67k £14.48k £1.03k £5.01k £7.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A