THE NEPTUNE ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To commemorate the memory of HMS Neptune and HMS Kandahar and the 837 men who died in the two ships; to establish a permanent memorial; to raise public awareness of the Neptune Association in the media; to educate the General Public through research into the circumstances surrounding the loss of HMS Neptune; to act as a focus point for relatives; to establish the location of Neptune's wreck.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Australia
- Canada
- Ireland
- Malta
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- South Africa
- United States
Governance
- 26 April 2004: Standard registration
- 04 September 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 04 September 2024: Funds transferred to 1043992 THE NATIONAL MEMORIAL ARBORETUM COMPANY LIMITED
No other names
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.85k | £2.39k | £2.68k | £2.27k | £1.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.30k | £2.74k | £598 | £2.88k | £2.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 July 2020 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED ON 20 MARCH 2004
Charitable objects
TO COMMEMORATE THE MEMORY OF HMS NEPTUNE AND THE 764 MEN WHO DIED WITH HER, AND OF HMS KANDAHAR AND THE 73 MEN WHO DIED WITH HER; TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A PERMANENT MEMORIAL TO THOSE WHO LOST THEIR LIVES IN THE SINKING OF HMS NEPTUNE AND HMS KANDAHAR DURING WORLD WAR TWO; TO DEVELOP AND RAISE PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE NEPTUNE ASSOCIATION IN THE MEDIA, THROUGH NEWSPAPER AND MAGAZINE ARTICLES AND RADIO AND TELEVISION PROGRAMMES; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC THROUGH THE UNDERTAKING OF RESEARCH INTO THE CIRCUMSTANCES AROUND THE LOSS OF HMS NEPTUNE AND OTHER SIMILAR SHIPS DURING WORLD WAR TWO; TO ACT AS A FOCUS POINT TO THE RELATIVES AND FRIENDS OF THOSE KILLED; TO MAKE GRANTS TO APPROPRIATE NAVAL CHARITIES OR POSSIBLY TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window