THE ORDER OF MISSION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Order of Mission is a worldwide network of Christian missionary leaders committed to the vows of simplicity, purity and accountability. It operates under a rule of life and gathers in small groups for community accountability and support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Denmark
- Germany
- Italy
- Peru
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 21 October 2003: Standard registration
- TOM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Askew | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev GARETH IAIN IRVINE | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Bearn | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Elizabeth Shepherd | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev PETER FINDLEY | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.05k | £24.84k | £34.55k | £36.07k | £25.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.16k | £29.88k | £28.73k | £36.93k | £22.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 MAY 2003.
Charitable objects
I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION II) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, AND III) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN A CHRISTIAN WAY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Order of Mission
c/o St John's Church
45 Westwood Heath Road
Coventry
CV4 8GN
- Phone:
- 01423 560558
- Email:
- secretary@missionorder.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window