GOSPORT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of older people who are no longer in full time employment. To put like minded people in touch with each other so that they may broaden and advance their interests and so have a fulfilling retirement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 01 October 2003: Standard registration
- THE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE - GOSPORT (Working name)
- U3A - GOSPORT (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Cantrill | Chair | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARIE-CHRISTINE NEAL | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
judith Foster | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith Ridley | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET GAVIN | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.45k | £8.33k | £10.38k | £11.52k | £10.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.19k | £4.51k | £13.04k | £9.28k | £10.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 APRIL 2003. AS AMENDED ON 27 APR 2017
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE NOT IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT WHO ARE IN THEIR THIRD AGE (BEING THE PERIOD OF TIME AFTER THE FIRST AGE OF CHILDHOOD DEPENDENCE AND THE SECOND AGE OF FULL TIME EMPLOYMENT AND/OR PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITY) RESIDING IN GOSPORT AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY. 2) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
118 The Avenue
GOSPORT
Hampshire
PO12 2JY
- Phone:
- 07739026648
- Email:
- treasurer@u3agosport.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window