GRACE CHURCH EXETER TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity carries out a wide range of activities in accordance with its charitable aims. The trustees consider that these activities, summarised in the report, provide benefit both to those who worship at our Church, the wider community of Devon and indeed the UK and world, and those in condition of need or hardship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 10 October 2003: Standard registration
- 15 May 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 15 May 2020: Funds transferred to 1182435 GRACE CHURCH EXETER
- FRONTIERS CHURCH EXETER TRUST (Previous name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/10/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £214.91k | £215.51k | £232.18k | £242.32k | £280.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £201.33k | £198.82k | £213.40k | £174.04k | £267.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 18 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 18 April 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 20 March 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 20 March 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 08 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | 08 May 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 14 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | 14 June 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 03/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08/06/2014
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window