Governing document REFUGEE AND MIGRANT DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION (RAMDA)
Charity number: 1101595

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JANUARY 2003, AS AMENDED 15 JUNE 2003, AS AMENDED 14 DECEMBER 2003, AS AMENDED 31 AUGUST 2006, AS AMENDED 28 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE HORN OF AFRICA COMMUNITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AS WELL AS EASTERN AFRICA KNOWN AS THE HORN OF AFRICA WHICH ARE SOMALIA AND ETHIOPIA.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
UK, SOMALIA AND ETHIOPIA.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.