EASINGWOLD AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing education, training, and vocational activities, to its membership, who are individuals no longer in full time employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 02 October 2003: Standard registration
- EASINGWOLD & DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Orr | Chair | 07 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Jane Susan Wintermeyer | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Beaumont | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Adkins | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Smith | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Cathryn Fergie | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Ridley | Trustee | 11 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander William Robinson | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Robinson | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Ogle | Trustee | 17 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Scott | Trustee | 19 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.32k | £15.48k | £12.10k | £17.25k | £15.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.61k | £14.32k | £14.54k | £16.83k | £15.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 AUGUST 2003. AS AMENDED ON 15 JAN 2019 AS AMENDED ON 16 JAN 2024 as amended on 04 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE NO LONGER IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN EASINGWOLD & DISTRICT AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY. 2) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
EASINGWOLD & DISTRICT AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Joseph Hutchinson Place
Easingwold
YORK
YO61 3FY
- Phone:
- 07779944595
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window