Financial history COMPASS COMMUNITY ARTS

Charity number: 1099983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.45k £29.52k £50.06k £64.12k £96.45k
Total expenditure £13.42k £15.22k £41.50k £61.04k £81.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.00k £6.84k N/A £12.00k