COMPASS COMMUNITY ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arts organisation providing arts and artistic experiences to members of the local community and especially to those marginalised groups and individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £12,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 10 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jan Christopher Myhill Koops | Chair | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Mary Kong | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tyron King | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Lena Fox | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Helene Ball | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Roxana Helen Minter | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jillian Carrington Burnet | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kim Carmichael | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.45k | £29.52k | £50.06k | £64.12k | £96.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.42k | £15.22k | £41.50k | £61.04k | £81.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | £6.84k | N/A | £12.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 JULY 2003 as amended on 14 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR VISUAL ARTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE EASTBOURNE, CROWBOROUGH AND ROCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
30-32 Gildredge Road
EASTBOURNE
East Sussex
BN21 4SH
- Phone:
- 07889805022
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window