ST ERME PLAYING FIELD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Throughout this financial year the activities we have put on to raise money are, car treasure hunt,foot treasure hunt, participation in village Fun Day, childrens' events in holiday times, bonfire night event, rounders match, our annual quiz, annual childrens christmas party and evening discos. We also hire out the main hall for parties, lectures, training sessions etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,958 from 2 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 10 December 2003: Standard registration
- ST ERME AND TRISPEN RECREATION FIELD COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT TRETHEWEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nicola Kimber | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ray Cramp | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vickie Williams | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen McGovern | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthea May Prowse | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gould | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Gould | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dale Hanns-Drake | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Maullin | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Mills | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hitchman | Trustee | 11 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Joy Mounter | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Hodgkinson | Trustee | 06 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tristan Jewel | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Light | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.65k | £80.38k | £79.62k | £83.42k | £93.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.73k | £66.47k | £72.40k | £95.98k | £108.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.67k | £20.61k | £35.24k | £13.37k | £6.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 JULY 1984 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 11 JULY 2008. as amended on 16 Jul 2019 as amended on 16 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
3. ALTERATION OF THE GOVERNING DOCUMENT THE GOVERNING DOCUMENT WILL TAKE EFFECT WITH CLAUSE (2) REPLACED BY THE FOLLOWING; (2) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ST ERME, CORNWALL WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF: (A) A SPORTS AND COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (I) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (II) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION; AND (B) A RECREATION GROUND FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
ST ERME, CORNWALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Community Centre
Castle Field
Trispen
Truro
Cornwall
- Phone:
- 01872276877
- Website:
-
stermecommunitycentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window