KIRKSTALL VALLEY PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish a new inner-city public park in the Kirkstall Valley in Leeds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leeds City
Governance
- 06 April 2005: Standard registration
- PUBLIC PARK IN KIRKSTALL VALLEY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Hodgson | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emmie Bromley | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Joy Peters-Esterine | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alia Fadel | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Ritchie | Trustee | 15 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
John Preston | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHRIS ROYFFE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ADRIAN NICHOLAS CURTIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.79k | £7.15k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.41k | £7.15k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 187 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 APRIL 2004, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28 FEBRUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
1) TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A PUBLIC PARK IN THE KIRKSTALL VALLEY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL INHABITANTS AND THE PUBLIC GENERALLY. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PROTECTION, CONSERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE NATURAL AND BUILT ENVIRONMENTS IN KIRKSTALL VALLEY PARK BY SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FORM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. 3) THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
KIRKSTALL VALLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Stephens Church Hall
Norman Street
LEEDS
LS5 3JN
- Phone:
- 07900986570
- Email:
- adele.rae@kvdt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window