Accounts and annual returns THE RICHARD WAKEFIELD BREAKFAST AND TEA TIME CLUB

Charity number: 1100069
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 March 2021 52 days late
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2021 729 days late
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 March 2018 35 days late