Financial history THE RICHARD WAKEFIELD BREAKFAST AND TEA TIME CLUB

Charity number: 1100069
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £30.98k £51.13k £27.67k £24.65k £28.77k
Total expenditure £38.25k £35.53k £34.10k £31.64k £30.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A